AL HB589 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Double Springs, City of, corp. limits alt., referendum
Title
Double Springs, City of, corp. limits alt., referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 582 |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |