AL HB586 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Winston Co., sheriff, service of process, fee increased, additional distrib. to Law Enforcement Fund and Circuit Clerk's Fund, referendum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Winston Co., sheriff, service of process, fee increased, additional distrib. to Law Enforcement Fund and Circuit Clerk's Fund, referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Executive Department
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-416.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2014-04-03HouseJohnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1119
2014-04-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1216
2014-04-03SenateReed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1215
2014-04-03SenateLocal Legislation No. 1 Amendment Offered
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2014-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 821
2014-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB586
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB586-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB586-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494392&VOTE=821&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500560&VOTE=1215&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500561&VOTE=1216&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500853&VOTE=1119&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback