AL HB583 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bay Minette, corp. limits alt.
Title
Bay Minette, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-03-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 801 |
2014-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |