AL HB582 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, business license requirements, electronic process for renewal authorized, contracts with vendors
Title
Municipalities, business license requirements, electronic process for renewal authorized, contracts with vendors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-528. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1417 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1049 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1048 |
2019-05-23 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |