AL HB582 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Title
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 30 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 30 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-409. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1213 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-03-18 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 857 |
2014-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 854 |
2014-03-18 | House | McMillan first Substitute offered |
2014-03-18 | House | McMillan motion to Table Baldwin County Legislation Substitute adopted Roll Call 855 |
2014-03-18 | House | McMillan motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 856 |
2014-03-18 | House | Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute resumed |
2014-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-18 | House | McMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | House | Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-18 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |