AL HB58 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-147.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-147.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation and Natural Resources, state parks, admission, free to Alabama residents who are active or retired military personnel, Park for Patriots Act, Sec. 9-14-8 am'd.
Title
Conservation and Natural Resources, state parks, admission, free to Alabama residents who are active or retired military personnel, Park for Patriots Act, Sec. 9-14-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Drake motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-147. |
2018-02-22 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2018-02-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | House | Drake motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 425 |
2018-02-22 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 409 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 408 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Dial Amendment Offered |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2018-01-16 | House | Engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2018-01-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 19 |
2018-01-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 18 |
2018-01-16 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Amendment Offered |
2018-01-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |