AL HB58 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Forwarded to Governor on June 9, 2011 at 4:40 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public officials or spouses of public officials, names and compensation of those who are employed by or have contracts with a municipality, a county, or the state, public disclosure required, filing with Ethics Commission, Sec. 36-25-5.1 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public officials or spouses of public officials, names and compensation of those who are employed by or have contracts with a municipality, a county, or the state, public disclosure required, filing with Ethics Commission, Sec. 36-25-5.1 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Ball motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Forwarded to Governor on June 9, 2011 at 4:40 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-674.
2011-06-09 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Ball motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1155
2011-06-09 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058
2011-06-09 Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1056.
2011-06-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1057
2011-06-09 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-06-02 Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2011-06-02 Third Reading Carried Over
2011-06-02 Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections second Amendment Offered
2011-04-12 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-03-29 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
2011-03-24 Engrossed
2011-03-24 Cosponsors Added
2011-03-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 72
2011-03-24 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 71
2011-03-24 Coleman Amendment Offered
2011-03-24 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 70
2011-03-24 Robinson (O) Amendment Offered
2011-03-24 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB58
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB58-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB58-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB58-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=398651&VOTE=70&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=398662&VOTE=71&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=398663&VOTE=72&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=398669&VOTE=73&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421771&VOTE=1073&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421776&VOTE=1056&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421772&VOTE=1058&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421815&VOTE=1155&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421771&VOTE=1057&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback