AL HB579 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

City of Athens, corp. limits alt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Athens, corp. limits alt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 19) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateFurther Consideration
2017-05-19SenateMelson motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-05-04HouseEngrossed
2017-05-17SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2017-05-04HouseButler and Mooney intended to "Abstain"
2017-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 767
2017-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 766
2017-05-04HouseCrawford Amendment Offered
2017-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback