AL HB579 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cherokee Co., sheriff, deputies, retired with 10 years service, authorized to receive badge, commission card, and pistol without cost
Title
Cherokee Co., sheriff, deputies, retired with 10 years service, authorized to receive badge, commission card, and pistol without cost
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-418. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1176 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 481 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |