AL HB578 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2012 at 2:455 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2012 at 2:455 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Development, additional class of community development district, established, incorporation and powers of districts, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B2, 35-8B-3 am'd
Title
Community Development, additional class of community development district, established, incorporation and powers of districts, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B2, 35-8B-3 am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Forwarded to Governor on May 3, 2012 at 2:455 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-327 on 05/10/2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1024 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Whatley to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities | |
2012-04-17 | Boman intended to vote "Yea" and Johnson (K), Buttram, Wallace and Baughn intended to vote "Nay" | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 833 | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |