AL HB57 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend Section 12-17-81 of the Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the salary of all circuit clerks in the Unified Judicial System based on the pay plan adopted by the personnel system of the Unified Judicial System.
Title
To amend Section 12-17-81 of the Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the salary of all circuit clerks in the Unified Judicial System based on the pay plan adopted by the personnel system of the Unified Judicial System.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-02 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-04 | House | Add Cosponsor |
2023-04-04 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-04 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund |
2023-03-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means General Fund |
2023-03-06 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-06 | House | Prefiled |