AL HB57 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fire safety, sky lanterns and novelty lighters, prohibited, penalties
Title
Fire safety, sky lanterns and novelty lighters, prohibited, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-19 | House | Engrossed |
2016-04-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 624 |
2016-04-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 623 |
2016-04-19 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |