AL HB569 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gulf Shores, corp. limits alt.
Title
Gulf Shores, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 79 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:17 a.m. on May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-413. |
2019-05-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1309 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 645 |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |