AL HB568 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bibb Co., supernumerary tax assessor-collector, compensation, cost-of-living increase

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bibb Co., supernumerary tax assessor-collector, compensation, cost-of-living increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseForwarded to Executive Department
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-382.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1032
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2016-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 767
2016-04-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback