AL HB568 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 8:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 8:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hazardous waste disposal, fee for certain hazardous wastes, restored, Secs. 22-30B-2.1 am'd.
Title
Hazardous waste disposal, fee for certain hazardous wastes, restored, Secs. 22-30B-2.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 8:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-418. |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1264 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-03-20 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 896 |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 895 |
2014-03-19 | House | McCampbell first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 894 |
2014-03-19 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-03-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |