AL HB568 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., revenue commissioner, judge of probate, and sheriff, assessment for monetary losses from official duties, liability limited
Title
Baldwin Co., revenue commissioner, judge of probate, and sheriff, assessment for monetary losses from official duties, liability limited
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Davis motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Davis motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-391. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1160 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 838 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 837 |
2013-04-25 | House | Davis first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Davis motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 737 |
2013-04-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommitted from the Calendar to Baldwin County Legislation |
2013-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |