AL HB567 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on May 24, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on May 24, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calhoun Co., court costs, drug and violent crime reduction fee in all criminal cases in circuit, district, municipal courts, distrib. to municipal and circuit court clerks, chief of police, county commission, and Calhoun/Cleburne Drug and Violent Crime Task Force
Title
Calhoun Co., court costs, drug and violent crime reduction fee in all criminal cases in circuit, district, municipal courts, distrib. to municipal and circuit court clerks, chief of police, county commission, and Calhoun/Cleburne Drug and Violent Crime Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Forwarded to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on May 24, 2011. | |
2011-05-24 | Assigned Act No. 2011-300. | |
2011-05-24 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-24 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 638 | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 562 | |
2011-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |