AL HB566 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Russell Co., motor vehicle licenses, add'l issuance fee, co. comm. auth. to levy, distrib. to Phenix City and co. commission
Title
Russell Co., motor vehicle licenses, add'l issuance fee, co. comm. auth. to levy, distrib. to Phenix City and co. commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 70 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-334. |
2015-05-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-28 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1253 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 929 |
2015-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |