AL HB564 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marshall Co., board of education, election of members from four single-member districts and county-wide, district boundaries, board authorized to change boundaries of election districts, procedures
Title
Marshall Co., board of education, election of members from four single-member districts and county-wide, district boundaries, board authorized to change boundaries of election districts, procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Long [R] | Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Senate - Scofield motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-22 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-21 - House - Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-22 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-21 - House - Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-324. | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Scofield motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 938 | |
2012-05-03 | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Scofield motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1068 | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-01 | Forwarded to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-19 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-19 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-04-19 | Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 913 | |
2012-04-19 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 664 | |
2012-04-19 | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 663 | |
2012-04-19 | Scofield Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 550 | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |