AL HB563 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., revenue commissioner, expense allowance and salary, retroactive
Title
Colbert Co., revenue commissioner, expense allowance and salary, retroactive
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 80 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017. |
2017-05-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-452. |
2017-05-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1302 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 746 |
2017-05-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |