AL HB562 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Retirement Systems, Teachers' and Employees', retirees, retirement benefits, compensation allowed from employers in system without suspension of benefits, annual amount increased, Secs. 16-25-26, 36-27-8.2 am'd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement Systems, Teachers' and Employees', retirees, retirement benefits, compensation allowed from employers in system without suspension of benefits, annual amount increased, Secs. 16-25-26, 36-27-8.2 am'd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-410.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04HouseEnrolled
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-04HousePassed Second House
2015-06-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1460
2015-06-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-06-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2015-05-19HouseEngrossed
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 840
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 839
2015-05-19HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2015-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-04-28HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB562
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB562-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB562-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB562-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519259&VOTE=839&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519260&VOTE=840&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526328&VOTE=1460&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback