AL HB562 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, tax on motor fuels, Secs. 8-17-95, 8-17-96, 8-17-97, 8-17-98, 8-17-99, 8-17-100, 8-17-101, 8-17-102 added; Sec. 8-17-89 repealed; Secs. 8-17-80, 8-17-84, 8-17-87, 8-17-91, 8-17-92, 8-17-93, 40-17-325, 40-17-329, 40-17-359, 40-17-362 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, tax on motor fuels, Secs. 8-17-95, 8-17-96, 8-17-97, 8-17-98, 8-17-99, 8-17-100, 8-17-101, 8-17-102 added; Sec. 8-17-89 repealed; Secs. 8-17-80, 8-17-84, 8-17-87, 8-17-91, 8-17-92, 8-17-93, 40-17-325, 40-17-329, 40-17-359, 40-17-362 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1270
2014-04-03SenateBedford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1269
2014-04-03SenateBedford Amendment Offered
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateMarsh motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1262
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2014-03-18HouseEngrossed
2014-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 833
2014-03-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 832
2014-03-18HouseLee Amendment Offered
2014-03-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 831
2014-03-18HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
2014-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-03-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB562
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB562-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494498&VOTE=831&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494501&VOTE=832&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494506&VOTE=833&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=501181&VOTE=1262&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=501207&VOTE=1269&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=501208&VOTE=1270&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback