AL HB562 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on May 9, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Nursing facilities, supplemental privilege assessment and monthly surcharge extended, expiration under certain conditions, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing facilities, supplemental privilege assessment and monthly surcharge extended, expiration under certain conditions, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-09HouseForwarded to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on May 9, 2013.
2013-05-09HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-240.
2013-05-09HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-09SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-09HouseEnrolled
2013-05-09HousePassed Second House
2013-05-09SenateSmitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 918
2013-05-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 917
2013-05-09SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 916
2013-05-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2013-04-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 706
2013-04-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback