AL HB562 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Conference Committee on HB562 2012RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-19 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Barton motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Conference Committee on HB562 2012RS first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Appointed
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1444 P&PO appoints Marsh, Keahey and Orr
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Requested
2012-05-16 Barton motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1545 House appoints Barton, Clouse and Hall
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1282
2012-05-09 Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1281
2012-05-09 Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2012-05-09 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2012-04-24 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2012-04-10 Engrossed
2012-04-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665
2012-04-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 664
2012-04-10 Barton Amendment Offered
2012-04-10 Barton motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2012-04-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 660
2012-04-10 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 659
2012-04-10 Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
2012-04-10 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2012-03-15 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB562
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB562-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB562-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=436485&VOTE=659&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=436489&VOTE=660&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=436548&VOTE=664&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=436549&VOTE=665&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448040&VOTE=1281&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448041&VOTE=1282&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449854&VOTE=1545&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450078&VOTE=1444&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback