AL HB562 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Delivered to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on May 24, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Washington Co., solicitor's fee authorized equal to fee for Fair Trial Tax Fund, distrib. to circuit clerk and district attorney

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington Co., solicitor's fee authorized equal to fee for Fair Trial Tax Fund, distrib. to circuit clerk and district attorney

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 27) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-24 Delivered to Governor at 2:55 p.m. on May 24, 2011.
2011-05-24 Assigned Act No. 2011-299.
2011-05-24 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-05-24 Signature Requested
2011-05-24 Enrolled
2011-05-24 Passed Second House
2011-05-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 636
2011-05-24 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-05-03 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2011-05-03 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 566
2011-05-03 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-28 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-04-27 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback