AL HB56 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Delivered to Governor at 10:13 a.m. on May 11, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal public housing authorities, non-profit affiliates of, limited immunity extended to, Sec. 24-1-27 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal public housing authorities, non-profit affiliates of, limited immunity extended to, Sec. 24-1-27 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:13 a.m. on May 11, 2017.
2017-05-11HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-315.
2017-05-11HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-11SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-09HouseEnrolled
2017-05-09HousePassed Second House
2017-05-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 974
2017-05-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 122
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback