AL HB56 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fantasy contests, regulation of, consumer protection measures by operators required, audits, civil penalties
Title
Fantasy contests, regulation of, consumer protection measures by operators required, audits, civil penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Lee motion to reconsider (Y: 13 N: 70 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 44 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 60 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 9 N: 82 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt State Government (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Moore (B) motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Lee motion to reconsider (Y: 13 N: 70 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 44 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 60 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Rowe motion to Table (Y: 9 N: 82 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - House - Motion to Adopt State Government (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Moore (B) motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-03-03 | House | Lee motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-03 | House | Wadsworth motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Voice Vote |
2016-03-03 | House | Rowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 217 |
2016-03-03 | House | McCampbell Amendment Offered |
2016-03-03 | House | Lee motion to reconsider lost Roll Call 216 |
2016-03-03 | House | Rowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 215 |
2016-03-03 | House | Rowe motion to Table lost Roll Call 214 |
2016-03-03 | House | Jones Amendment Offered |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 213 |
2016-03-03 | House | Knight Amendment Offered |
2016-03-03 | House | Rowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 212 |
2016-03-03 | House | Knight Substitute resumed |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-03-01 | House | Lee motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-01 | House | Rowe motion to Table lost Roll Call 200 |
2016-03-01 | House | Knight first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-01 | House | Motion to Adopt State Government adopted Roll Call 199 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rowe motion to reconsider State Government amendment adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-01 | House | Moore (B) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 198 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rowe first Substitute Offered |
2016-03-01 | House | Rowe motion to Table adopted Roll Call 197 |
2016-03-01 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-02-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |