AL HB558 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Accountability Act, $7,500 limit on scholarship contributions by individual taxpayers removed, pass-through entities allowed to make contributions to scholarship granting organizations, release date for unaccounted scholarship funds moved, reporting period changed from calendar to school year, Sec. 16-6D-9 am'd.
Title
Alabama Accountability Act, $7,500 limit on scholarship contributions by individual taxpayers removed, pass-through entities allowed to make contributions to scholarship granting organizations, release date for unaccounted scholarship funds moved, reporting period changed from calendar to school year, Sec. 16-6D-9 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |
2014-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 882 |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 881 |
2014-03-19 | House | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 880 |
2014-03-19 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-03-11 | House | HB558 rereferred from WME to EP |
2014-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |