AL HB558 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Randolph Co., tobacco tax, collection and distrib., Act 2003-213, 2003 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Randolph Co., tobacco tax, collection and distrib., Act 2003-213, 2003 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-389. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1158 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 544 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |