AL HB556 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Delivered to Governor at 6:38 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Delivered to Governor at 6:38 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chilton Co., sex offender, prohibit sex offender from residing in a home or other living accommodation with other sex offenders, civil penalties against owner or lessor of property, distribution to sheriff and district attorney
Title
Chilton Co., sex offender, prohibit sex offender from residing in a home or other living accommodation with other sex offenders, civil penalties against owner or lessor of property, distribution to sheriff and district attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:38 p.m. on March 18, 2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-214. |
2014-03-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 810 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 523 |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |