AL HB556 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wilcox Co., sheriff, authorized to provide retiring officer with badge and pistol, retroactive effect
Title
Wilcox Co., sheriff, authorized to provide retiring officer with badge and pistol, retroactive effect
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-388. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1157 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 958 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 479 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |