AL HB555 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Phenix City, board of education, election of members, qualifications, terms, compensation, filling vacancies, referendum, Act 929, 1971 Reg. Sess. repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Phenix City, board of education, election of members, qualifications, terms, compensation, filling vacancies, referendum, Act 929, 1971 Reg. Sess. repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 81 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:49 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-450.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HousePassed Second House
2017-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1315
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2017-05-17HouseEngrossed
2017-05-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 974
2017-05-17HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 973
2017-05-17HouseLocal Legislation first Substitute Offered
2017-05-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-04-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback