AL HB554 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 5:43 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 5:43 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State agencies, Department of Commerce, transfer of certain programs of the Department of Economic and Community Affairs and the Department of Postsecondary Education, Secs. 41-29-5, 41-29-240, 41-29-241, 41-29-250, 41-29-260, 41-29-270, 41-29-300 added; Sec. 41-9-204 repealed; Secs. 41-9-201, 41-9-202, 41-9-202.1, 41-9-203 amended and renumbered as 41-29-1, 41-29-2, 41-29-3, 41-29-4, 41-9-760 to 41-9-767, incl., am'd and renumbered as 41-29-220 to 41-29-227, incl., 41-9-1080 to 41-9-1086, incl., am'd and renumbered as 41-29-280 to 41-29-286, incl., 16-66-1 to 16-66-8, incl., am'd and renumbered as 41-29-290 to 41-29-297, inclusive
Title
State agencies, Department of Commerce, transfer of certain programs of the Department of Economic and Community Affairs and the Department of Postsecondary Education, Secs. 41-29-5, 41-29-240, 41-29-241, 41-29-250, 41-29-260, 41-29-270, 41-29-300 added; Sec. 41-9-204 repealed; Secs. 41-9-201, 41-9-202, 41-9-202.1, 41-9-203 amended and renumbered as 41-29-1, 41-29-2, 41-29-3, 41-29-4, 41-9-760 to 41-9-767, incl., am'd and renumbered as 41-29-220 to 41-29-227, incl., 41-9-1080 to 41-9-1086, incl., am'd and renumbered as 41-29-280 to 41-29-286, incl., 16-66-1 to 16-66-8, incl., am'd and renumbered as 41-29-290 to 41-29-297, inclusive
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Baker motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Baker motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:43 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | State Government first Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-450. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-04 | House | Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1325 |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1503 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1502 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1501 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1500 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2015-05-07 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 619 |
2015-05-07 | House | Baker motion to Table adopted Roll Call 618 |
2015-05-07 | House | Rogers Amendment Offered |
2015-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 617 |
2015-05-07 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2015-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 616 |
2015-05-07 | House | State Government first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |