AL HB552 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, natural gas, requirement of decal from Liquefied Petroleum Gas Board suspended until October 2016, tax provided under certain conditions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, natural gas, requirement of decal from Liquefied Petroleum Gas Board suspended until October 2016, tax provided under certain conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-408.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1202
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Energy and Natural Resources
2014-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 829
2014-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-26HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback