AL HB552 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Madison County, lodging tax, distrib. to U.S. Space and Rocket Center Foundation, termination date, Act 2004-418, 2004 Reg. Sess., am'd
Title
Madison County, lodging tax, distrib. to U.S. Space and Rocket Center Foundation, termination date, Act 2004-418, 2004 Reg. Sess., am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-442. | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1254 | |
2012-05-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 4 | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Madison County Legislation |