AL HB550 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Travel expenses, state officers and employees, actual expenses for travel within state, to include state organizations where state or individual is a dues-paying member, Sec. 36-7-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Travel expenses, state officers and employees, actual expenses for travel within state, to include state organizations where state or individual is a dues-paying member, Sec. 36-7-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-409.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HousePassed Second House
2017-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1326
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-19SenatePittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-05-17SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
2017-05-16HouseEngrossed
2017-05-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 901
2017-05-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 900
2017-05-16HouseState Government Amendment Offered
2017-05-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback