AL HB550 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Jefferson County Legislation second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fairfield, motor vehicles, automated traffic infraction device, use for red light enforcement authorized, procedures, posting of informational signs, civil fines, record keeping by Criminal Justice Information Center, appeals, tampering with photographic traffic signal enforcement system, prohibited, Fairfield Red Light Safety Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairfield, motor vehicles, automated traffic infraction device, use for red light enforcement authorized, procedures, posting of informational signs, civil fines, record keeping by Criminal Justice Information Center, appeals, tampering with photographic traffic signal enforcement system, prohibited, Fairfield Red Light Safety Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 59 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 59 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 60 Abs: 25) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseJefferson County Legislation second Amendment Offered
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1030
2016-05-04SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1029
2016-05-04SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1028
2016-05-04SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2016-05-04SenateLocal Legislation, Jefferson County Amendment Offered
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
2016-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2016-04-21HouseEngrossed
2016-04-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 702
2016-04-21HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 701
2016-04-21HouseJefferson County Legislation Amendment #2 Offered
2016-04-21HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 700
2016-04-21HouseJefferson County Legislation Amendment #1 Offered
2016-04-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2016-04-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB550
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB550-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=548390&VOTE=700&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=548401&VOTE=701&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=548403&VOTE=702&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552652&VOTE=1028&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552653&VOTE=1029&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552654&VOTE=1030&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback