AL HB549 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gilbertown, corp. limits, alt.
Title
Gilbertown, corp. limits, alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 2:13 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-323. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 973 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 416 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |