AL HB548 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Marsh first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Partnerships and limited liability companies, Subchapter K entities and Alabama S corporations, owners and resident beneficiaries of estates or trusts provided a proportionate tax credit for taxes paid to a foreign country, Secs. 40-18-14, 40-18-21 am'd. (2011-20801)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Partnerships and limited liability companies, Subchapter K entities and Alabama S corporations, owners and resident beneficiaries of estates or trusts provided a proportionate tax credit for taxes paid to a foreign country, Secs. 40-18-14, 40-18-21 am'd. (2011-20801)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Marsh first Substitute Offered
2011-06-09 Third Reading Open
2011-05-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-05-05 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2011-05-04 Engrossed
2011-05-04 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 648
2011-05-04 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 647
2011-05-04 Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2011-05-04 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2011-04-21 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback