AL HB546 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:09 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:09 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gardendale school tax district of Jefferson County Board of Education, renewal of ad valorem tax, referendum
Title
Gardendale school tax district of Jefferson County Board of Education, renewal of ad valorem tax, referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1182 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 1181 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 741 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 740 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 50 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 1181 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 741 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 740 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 50 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 1:09 p.m. on April 29, 2021. |
2021-04-29 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-394. |
2021-04-29 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1182 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2021-04-13 | House | Alexander intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 741 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |