AL HB546 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 6:12 p.m. on May 26, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 6:12 p.m. on May 26, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Heflin, alcoholic beverages, draft beer, sale under certain conditions, purchase or lease of necessary equipment required
Title
Heflin, alcoholic beverages, draft beer, sale under certain conditions, purchase or lease of necessary equipment required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:12 p.m. on May 26, 2015. |
2015-05-26 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-296. |
2015-05-26 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1168 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 734 |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | House | Black motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |