AL HB543 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-455.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Judges, recusals, appearance of impartiality based on campaign contribution, rebuttable presumption if contribution represents 25 percent of total contribution for election cycle, Secs. 12-24-1, 12-24-2 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges, recusals, appearance of impartiality based on campaign contribution, rebuttable presumption if contribution represents 25 percent of total contribution for election cycle, Secs. 12-24-1, 12-24-2 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-455.
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 7:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1259
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2014-04-01SenateWard motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-01SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2014-03-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2014-03-13HouseEngrossed
2014-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 766
2014-03-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 765
2014-03-13HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
2014-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-05HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-02-26HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB543
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB543-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB543-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB543-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493706&VOTE=765&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493769&VOTE=766&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=501010&VOTE=1259&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback