AL HB542 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture and Industries Department, weighmasters, appointed by Commissioner, bond requirement deleted, Sec. 8-16-52 repealed
Title
Agriculture and Industries Department, weighmasters, appointed by Commissioner, bond requirement deleted, Sec. 8-16-52 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 a. m. on May 9, 2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-399. | |
2012-05-09 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1187 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-04-10 | Bracy intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 642 | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |