AL HB540 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., property tax commissioner, business personal property tax, electronic filing of returns provided for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., property tax commissioner, business personal property tax, electronic filing of returns provided for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 53 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 21) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Governor on April 3, 2014 at 5:44 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseBaldwin County Legislation first Amendment Offered
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-449.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1211
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2014-03-05HouseEngrossed
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 530
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 529
2014-03-05HouseBaldwin County Legislation Amendment Offered
2014-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-02-26HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB540
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB540-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB540-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB540-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=491200&VOTE=529&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=491201&VOTE=530&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500546&VOTE=1211&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback