AL HB540 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lee Co., sales and use tax, county commission authorized to levy outside corporate limits of Auburn, Opelika, and Phenix City, Act 1254, 1969 Sp. Sess.; Act 89-629, 1989 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Lee Co., sales and use tax, county commission authorized to levy outside corporate limits of Auburn, Opelika, and Phenix City, Act 1254, 1969 Sp. Sess.; Act 89-629, 1989 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. George Bandy [D] | Rep. Harry Bridges [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Lesley Vance [R] |
Rep. Pebblin Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 3:25 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-588. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 949 | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Lee County Legislation |