AL HB539 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., sheriff, fees authorized for services such as fingerprinting, criminal history investigations and reports, distrib. to county general fund (2011-20958)
Title
Montgomery Co., sheriff, fees authorized for services such as fingerprinting, criminal history investigations and reports, distrib. to county general fund (2011-20958)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 47 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 47 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:15 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-587. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 910 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-26 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 916 | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 915 | |
2011-05-26 | Montgomery County Legislation first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |