AL HB538 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
County commission, forestry operations, use of roads, regulation by, procedures, Sec. 23-1-80.1 added (2012-20510)
Title
County commission, forestry operations, use of roads, regulation by, procedures, Sec. 23-1-80.1 added (2012-20510)
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Carns [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Richard Laird [D] |
Rep. Steve McMillan [R] | Rep. Barry Moore [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Rep. Kurt Wallace [R] |
Sen. April Weaver [R] | Rep. Jack Williams [R] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 840 | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 839 | |
2012-04-17 | Tuggle Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 838 | |
2012-04-17 | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-03-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |