AL HB537 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Delivered to Governor at 9:31 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Delivered to Governor at 9:31 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Recruitment Institute, membership of Board of Directors increased, appointing authorities altered, Sec. 40-10-724 am'd.
Title
Construction Recruitment Institute, membership of Board of Directors increased, appointing authorities altered, Sec. 40-10-724 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:31 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-345. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | House | Standridge intended to vote "Yea" |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-04-01 | House | Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1052 |
2014-04-01 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1124 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1123 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 871 |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |