AL HB537 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Judicial offices, maximum age for election or appointment to judicial office increased to 72 years, Section 6.16 (Section 155, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd., const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial offices, maximum age for election or appointment to judicial office increased to 72 years, Section 6.16 (Section 155, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd., const. amend.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Further Consideration
2010-04-22 Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Roll Call 1224
2010-04-22 Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1223
2010-04-22 Barron Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Motion to Miscellaneous lost
2010-04-22 Third Reading Carried Over
2010-04-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1214
2010-04-22 Lost in second house
2010-04-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-14 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Economic Expansion and Trade
2010-04-13 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 990
2010-04-13 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-11 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback