AL HB536 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin Co., churches, self-defense, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others, const. amend.
Title
Franklin Co., churches, self-defense, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others, const. amend.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Kiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Stutts motion to adopt Local Application Resolution (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 48 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 48 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:03 a.m. on May 16, 2019. |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-194. |
2019-05-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Stutts motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 755 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 754 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 567 |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 566 |
2019-05-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |